House | 05/05/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Chotzen. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 7--Drazan, Hartman, Nguyen H, Ruiz, Sosa, Tran, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Diehl. | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Anderson; Excused, 3--Hayden, Patterson, Starr. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |