House | 05/07/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Final reading. Carried by Sollman, Starr. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Recommendation: Do adopt. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |