Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania House Bill HB1362 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                             
PRINTER'S NO. 1549 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
HOUSE BILL 
No.1362 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY GAYDOS, KUTZ, KAUFFMAN, KENYATTA, HAMM, 
M. MACKENZIE, ROWE, BANTA, SCIALABBA AND BERNSTINE, 
APRIL 30, 2025 
REFERRED TO COMMITTEE ON FINANCE, APRIL 30, 2025 
AN ACT
Establishing the Taxpayer Dividend Program; imposing powers and 
duties on the State Treasurer and Department of Revenue; and 
providing for payment of certain taxpayer dividends.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  Short title.
This act shall be known and may be cited as the Taxpayer 
Dividend Program Act of 2025.
Section 2.  Legislative findings.
The General Assembly finds and declares as follows:
(1)  Over the past four fiscal years, the General 
Assembly has deposited $6.3 billion of surplus General Fund 
money in the Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund, which is 
commonly known as the Rainy Day Fund.
(2)  Many of these annual deposits in the Budget 
Stabilization Reserve Fund exceeded the statutorily required 
minimum amounts of up to 20% of the prior fiscal year's 
surplus.
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18 (3)  The balance of the Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund 
was projected to be at least $7.49 billion by the end of the 
2024-2025 fiscal year.
(4)  The General Fund had a projected surplus of at least 
$3.2 billion by the end of the 2024-2025 fiscal year.
(5)  Many lobbyists, stakeholders and elected officials 
are lining up to spend the entire General Fund surplus and 
the Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund.
(6)  The Governor's proposed spending increases for the 
2025-2026 fiscal year would extinguish what is left of the 
General Fund surplus and would require the use of fund 
transfers from the Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund.
(7)  Rather than using the Commonwealth's General Fund 
surplus and Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund balance to pay 
for unsustainable spending through expanded programs that 
will create ongoing increased spending, the General Assembly 
should return a portion of the surplus to the resident 
individual taxpayers who paid the taxes that lead to the 
surplus and balance.
Section 3.  Definitions.
The following words and phrases when used in this act shall 
have the meanings given to them in this section unless the 
context clearly indicates otherwise:
"Program."  The Taxpayer Dividend Program established by this 
act.
"Resident individual."  The term shall have the same meaning 
given to it in section 301(p) of the act of March 4, 1971 
(P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971.
"Surplus."  As defined in section 1702-A(d) of the act of 
April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code.
20250HB1362PN1549 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 "Taxpayer dividend."  The amount determined under section 
7(b).
Section 4.  Taxpayer Dividend Program.
(a)  Establishment.--The Taxpayer Dividend Program is 
established in the Treasury Department.
(b)  Purpose.--The program shall refund to the Commonwealth's 
taxpaying families a portion of the budget surpluses that have 
accrued in the General Fund and the Budget Stabilization Reserve 
Fund.
Section 5.  Program funding.
(a)  Source of funding.--For the 2025-2026 fiscal year, the 
General Assembly may appropriate amounts from the General Fund 
to the Treasury Department for the purpose of the program.
(b)  Limitations.--
(1)  The amount of the appropriation authorized under 
subsection (a) from the General Fund may not exceed the 
surplus available in the General Fund as of June 30, 2025.
(2)  Any money appropriated under this subsection which 
would otherwise lapse to the General Fund shall be 
transferred to the Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund.
Section 6.  Determination of eligible resident individuals.
No later than 45 days after enactment of an appropriation 
under section 5(a), the Department of Revenue shall determine 
the following:
(1)  The name and last known address of every resident 
individual who timely filed an individual annual return under 
Article III of the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known 
as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, for the taxable year 
beginning January 1, 2024, and who timely paid any tax 
liability due.
20250HB1362PN1549 	- 3 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 (2)  The name and last known address of every resident 
individual who was included in a timely filed joint annual 
return under Article III of the Tax Reform Code of 1971 for 
the taxable year beginning January 1, 2024, and who timely 
paid any tax liability due.
(3)  If known, the automated clearinghouse information 
for each resident individual described under paragraphs (1) 
and (2).
Section 7.  Determination of amount of taxpayer dividend for 
each resident individual.
(a)  Determination.--No later than 15 days after the 
determination under section 6, the Department of Revenue shall 
determine the amount of the taxpayer dividend under subsection 
(b).
(b)  Calculation of taxpayer dividend.--The taxpayer dividend 
shall be the lesser of the following:
(1)  the total amount appropriated under section 5(a) 
divided by the sum of the total number of resident 
individuals described under section 6(1) and (2); or
(2)  the amount of $1,000.
Section 8.  Transmittal of names, last known addresses and 
payment information.
No later than 21 days after the determination under section 
6, the Department of Revenue shall transmit to the State 
Treasurer all of the following information:
(1)  The name of each resident individual under section 
6(1) and (2).
(2)  The last known address for each resident individual 
under section 6(1) and (2).
(3)  The automated clearinghouse information under 
20250HB1362PN1549 	- 4 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 section 6(3).
(4)  The amount of the taxpayer dividend determined under 
section 7(b).
Section 9.  Payments.
(a)  Duty of State Treasurer.--No later than 15 days after 
receipt of the information transmitted under section 8, the 
State Treasurer shall disburse to each resident individual under 
section 8(1) a payment in the amount of the taxpayer dividend.
(b)  Payment method.--
(1)  Except as provided under paragraph (2), the taxpayer 
dividend shall be paid to each resident individual under 
section 6(1) and (2) in the form of a check mailed to the 
resident individual's last known address.
(2)  If the Department of Revenue transmits automated 
clearinghouse information for a resident individual under 
section 6(3), the State Treasurer shall pay the taxpayer 
dividend through an automated clearinghouse transaction.
Section 10.  Reports.
(a)  Report required.--No later than March 31, 2026, or 90 
days after the payments are made under section 9, whichever is 
later, the Treasury Department, in consultation with the 
Department of Revenue, shall publish a report on the program.
(b)  Publication and transmission.--The State Treasurer shall 
publish the report on the Treasury Department's publicly 
accessible Internet website and shall transmit a copy of the 
report to the chair and minority chair of the Appropriations 
Committee of the Senate and the chair and minority chair of the 
Appropriations Committee of the House of Representatives.
(c)  Report contents.--The report shall include the following 
information:
20250HB1362PN1549 	- 5 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 (1)  The total dollar amount of taxpayer dividends paid 
to resident individuals under this act.
(2)  The total number of resident individuals who 
received a payment under this act.
Section 11.  Effective date.
This act shall take effect immediately.
20250HB1362PN1549 	- 6 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6