Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | In the Senate | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Re-reported as committed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Second consideration | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Removed from table | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | First consideration | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported as committed | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Referred to JUDICIARY |