Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB166 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                             
PRINTER'S NO. 535 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE BILL 
No.166 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY MARTIN, APRIL 3, 2025 
REFERRED TO APPROPRIATIONS, APRIL 3, 2025 
AN ACT
Making appropriations from the State Employees' Retirement Fund 
and from the SERS Defined Contribution Fund to provide for 
expenses of the State Employees' Retirement Board for the 
fiscal year July 1, 2025, to June 30, 2026, and for the 
payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close 
of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  The sum of $39,795,000, or as much thereof as may 
be necessary, is hereby appropriated from the State Employees' 
Retirement Fund to the State Employees' Retirement Board for the 
payment of all salaries, wages and other compensation and travel 
expenses of the employees and members of the State Employees' 
Retirement Board, for contractual services and other expenses 
necessary for the proper conduct of the duties, functions and 
activities of the board for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 
2025, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid 
at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025.
Section 2.  The sum of $5,979,000, or as much thereof as may 
be necessary, is hereby appropriated from the SERS Defined 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20 Contribution Fund authorized under section 1799.7-E of the act 
of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, to 
the State Employees' Retirement Board for the payment of all 
salaries, wages and other compensation and travel expenses of 
the employees and members of the State Employees' Retirement 
Board, for contractual services and other expenses necessary for 
the proper conduct of the duties, functions and activities of 
the board related to the administration of the State Employees' 
Defined Contribution Plan established under 71 Pa.C.S. Ch. 58 
(relating to State Employees' Defined Contribution Plan) for the 
fiscal year beginning July 1, 2025, and for the payment of bills 
incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2025.
Section 3.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2025, or 
immediately, whichever is later.
20250SB0166PN0535 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15