Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB451 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                             
PRINTER'S NO. 413 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE BILL 
No.451 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY PHILLIPS-HILL, LAUGHLIN, BROWN AND PENNYCUICK, 
MARCH 17, 2025 
REFERRED TO STATE GOVERNMENT, MARCH 17, 2025 
AN ACT
Amending Title 45 (Legal Notices) of the Pennsylvania 
Consolidated Statutes, in legal advertising, providing for 
disclosure of taxpayer-funded advertising and public notices.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  Title 45 of the Pennsylvania Consolidated 
Statutes is amended by adding a section to read:
ยง 311.  Disclosure of taxpayer-funded advertising and public 
notices.
(a)  Dollar amount.--An advertisement, legal advertisement, 
official advertisement or legal notice required to be published 
in a newspaper under the following must include the dollar 
amount paid by the advertiser in the lower right-hand corner:
(1)  The act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known 
as The First Class Township Code.
(2)  The act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as 
The Second Class Township Code.
(3)  Article II of the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18 No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949.
(4)  The act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as 
the Second Class County Code.
(5)  The act of July 15, 1957 (P.L.901, No.399), known as 
the Optional Third Class City Charter Law.
(6)  8 Pa.C.S. (relating to boroughs and incorporated 
towns).
(7)  11 Pa.C.S. (relating to cities).
(8)  16 Pa.C.S. (relating to counties).
(9)  65 Pa.C.S. Ch. 7 (relating to open meetings).
(b)  Additional fee prohibited.--A publisher of an 
advertisement, legal advertisement, official advertisement or 
legal notice under subsection (a) may not charge an additional 
fee for inclusion of the dollar amount paid in the publication.
Section 2.  This act shall apply to an advertisement, legal 
advertisement, official advertisement or legal notice published 
on or after the effective date of this section.
Section 3.  This act shall take effect in 60 days.
20250SB0451PN0413 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18