Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB645 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                             
PRINTER'S NO. 657 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE BILL 
No.645 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY LANGERHOLC, CULVER, ROTHMAN, J. WARD, LAUGHLIN, 
BROWN, MASTRIANO, PENNYCUICK, VOGEL AND STEFANO, 
APRIL 21, 2025 
REFERRED TO EDUCATION, APRIL 21, 2025 
AN ACT
Amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), entitled "An 
act relating to the public school system, including certain 
provisions applicable as well to private and parochial 
schools; amending, revising, consolidating and changing the 
laws relating thereto," in preliminary provisions, further 
providing for definitions; in terms and courses of study, 
further providing for subjects of instruction and flag code 
and providing for handwriting instruction required; and, in 
charter schools, further providing for provisions applicable 
to charter schools and for applicability of other provisions 
of this act and of other acts and regulations.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  Section 102 of the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, 
No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, is amended by 
adding a definition to read:
Section 102.  Definitions.--When used in this act the 
following words and phrases shall have the following meanings:
* * *
"Cursive handwriting."  A style of penmanship in which the 
symbols of the language are written in a conjoined or flowing 
manner often with the strokes of successive characters joined 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22 and the angles rounded.
* * *
Section 2.  Section 1511 of the act is amended to read:
Section 1511.  Subjects of Instruction; Flag Code.--In every 
elementary public and private school, established and maintained 
in this Commonwealth, the following subjects shall be taught, in 
the English language and from English texts: English, including 
spelling, reading and writing, which shall include cursive 
handwriting, arithmetic, geography, the history of the United 
States and of Pennsylvania, civics, including loyalty to the 
State and National Government, safety education, and the humane 
treatment of birds and animals, health, including physical 
education, and physiology, music and art. Other subjects shall 
be taught in the public elementary schools and also in the 
public high schools as may be prescribed by the standards of the 
State Board of Education. All such subjects, except foreign 
languages, shall be taught in the English language and from 
English texts: Provided, however, That, at the discretion of the 
[Superintendent of Public Instruction ] Secretary of Education , 
the teaching of subjects in a language other than English may be 
permitted as part of a sequence in foreign language study or as 
part of a bilingual education program if the teaching personnel 
are properly certified in the subject fields. Each school 
district shall provide and distribute to each pupil, enrolled in 
the eighth grade of the public schools, one illustrated copy of 
the National Flag Code, and shall, from time to time, make 
available such copies as are necessary for replacements from 
year to year. It shall be the duty of each teacher in the public 
schools to make such use of the code as may, from time to time, 
seem proper.
20250SB0645PN0657 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 Section 3.  The act is amended by adding a section to read:
Section 1529.  Handwriting Instruction Required.--Each 
student shall receive cursive handwriting instruction to ensure 
that students have the ability to read and write cursive 
handwriting by the end of fifth grade.
Section 4.  Section 1732-A(a) of the act is amended to read:
Section 1732-A.  Provisions Applicable to Charter Schools.--
(a)  Charter schools shall be subject to the following:
Sections 108, 110, 111, 321, 325, 326, 327, 431, 436, 443, 
510, 518, 527, 708, 736, 737, 738, 739, 740, 741, 752, 753, 755, 
771, 776, 777, 808, 809, 810, 1109, 1111, 1112(a), 1301, 1310, 
1317, 1317.1, 1317.2, 1318, 1326, 1327, 1327.2, 1329, 1330, 
1332, 1333, 1333.1, 1333.2, 1333.3, 1303-A, 1513, 1517, 1518, 
1521, 1523, 1529, 1531, 1547, 2014-A, Article XIII-A and Article 
XIV.
Act of July 17, 1961 (P.L.776, No.341), known as the 
"Pennsylvania Fair Educational Opportunities Act."
Act of July 19, 1965 (P.L.215, No.116), entitled "An act 
providing for the use of eye protective devices by persons 
engaged in hazardous activities or exposed to known dangers in 
schools, colleges and universities."
Section 4 of the act of January 25, 1966 (1965 P.L.1546, 
No.541), entitled "An act providing scholarships and providing 
funds to secure Federal funds for qualified students of the 
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania who need financial assistance to 
attend postsecondary institutions of higher learning, making an 
appropriation, and providing for the administration of this 
act."
Act of July 12, 1972 (P.L.765, No.181), entitled "An act 
relating to drugs and alcohol and their abuse, providing for 
20250SB0645PN0657 	- 3 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 projects and programs and grants to educational agencies, other 
public or private agencies, institutions or organizations."
Act of December 15, 1986 (P.L.1595, No.175), known as the 
"Antihazing Law."
* * *
Section 5.  Section 1749-A(a)(1) of the act, reenacted and 
amended October 31, 2024 (P.L.1129, No.135), is amended by 
adding a subparagraph to read:
Section 1749-A.  Applicability of other provisions of this act 
and of other acts and regulations.
(a)  General requirements.--Cyber charter schools shall be 
subject to the following:
(1)  The following:
* * *
(liii.1)  Section 1529.
* * *
Section 6.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2025.
20250SB0645PN0657 	- 4 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17