LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Pennsylvania PA
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB78
Action History
PA
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB78
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB78
Action History
House
03/25/2025
Referred to TRANSPORTATION
House
03/24/2025
In the House
Senate
03/24/2025
Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
Senate
01/29/2025
Second consideration, *Opening Vote* Jan. 29, 2025 (49-0)
Senate
01/28/2025
First consideration
Senate
01/28/2025
Reported as committed