Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB84 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                             
PRINTER'S NO. 39 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE BILL 
No.84 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY ARGALL, BROWN, COLEMAN, DUSH, FONTANA AND MILLER, 
JANUARY 22, 2025 
REFERRED TO INSTITUTIONAL SUSTAINABILITY AND INNOVATION, 
JANUARY 22, 2025 
AN ACT
Amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), entitled "An 
act relating to the public school system, including certain 
provisions applicable as well to private and parochial 
schools; amending, revising, consolidating and changing the 
laws relating thereto ," in construction and renovation of 
buildings by school entities, further providing for 
definitions and for building condition assessments.
The General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania 
hereby enacts as follows:
Section 1.  Section 2601-J of the act of March 10, 1949 
(P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, is 
amended by adding definitions to read:
Section 2601-J. Definitions.
The following words and phrases when used in this article 
shall have the meanings given to them in this section unless the 
context clearly indicates otherwise:
* * *
"Equipment."  The term includes property, whether fixed or 
movable, that is incidental and necessary to conduct an 
educational program. The term includes, but is not limited to, 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20 movable equipment such as desks, chairs, tables, information 
technology infrastructure, portable physical education 
equipment, audio-visual equipment and science, family and 
consumer science, industrial art and business equipment and 
instructional materials and fixtures such as casework, 
laboratory equipment, kitchen equipment, auditorium seating and 
any other special fixtures or equipment required to conduct a 
particular educational program.
* * *
"Maintenance costs."  The term includes the cost for routine, 
preventative, predictive and emergent unscheduled tasks and 
minor repairs required to ensure that a facility functions 
according to its design and for its expected lifespan.
"Nonconstruction costs."  The term includes design fees, 
financing, permitting, construction management fees, legal fees, 
advertising fees, insurance and equipment.
"Operations costs."  The term includes the cost for 
custodial, security and utility services required to keep a 
facility clean and safe so that occupants are comfortable, 
healthy and productive, and for the operational services 
required for a vacant facility or site.
* * *
"Total project costs."  The term includes all of the costs to 
implement a facility improvement measure, including, but not 
limited to, construction, site costs and nonconstruction costs.
* * *
Section 2.  Section 2605-J of the act is amended to read:
Section 2605-J.  [Building] Facilities condition assessments.
[(a)  Duties of department.--
(1)  The department shall develop guidelines for school 
20250SB0084PN0039 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 entities to voluntarily report information related to school 
building safety, inventory and condition. The guidelines 
shall include a building condition assessment to be 
voluntarily completed every 10 years for school entities that 
includes, but is not limited to, a projection of costs to 
maintain and renovate existing school buildings.
(2)  The department shall post completed building 
condition assessments on the department's publicly accessible 
Internet website.
(3)  The department shall provide additional points under 
the funding rubric contained in section 2604-J(d) for grants 
applied for by school entities that complete building 
condition assessments.
(b)  Completion incentive.--A school entity that completes a 
building condition assessment shall receive a 2% increase above 
the amount calculated under section 2606-J. The department shall 
develop a process, in coordination with the application process 
in section 2602-J, for awarding an enhanced reimbursement for 
completing a building condition assessment. ]
(c)  Duty of department.--By October 1, 2025, the department 
shall develop a facilities condition assessment form for a 
school entity to use in filing assessments under subsection (d). 
The form shall require the following information to be reported:
(1)  School entity enrollment.
(2)  A list of the names, addresses, building age, 
including dates and descriptions of major renovations, owned 
or leased status, including who is responsible for 
maintenance, of all school entity buildings.
(3)  A condition assessment of all school entity 
buildings, including:
20250SB0084PN0039 	- 3 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 (i)  Structural components, including walls, floors, 
roofs, windows and doors.
(ii)  System components, including mechanical, 
electrical, plumbing, ventilation, heating and air 
conditioning.
(iii)  Interior components, including finishes and 
fixtures.
(iv)  Exterior components, including finishes and 
fixtures.
(4)  Estimated annual operations costs and maintenance 
costs for the next seven years.
(5)  Expected facility improvements, including estimated 
total project costs for the next five years.
(6)  Asbestos, lead, air quality and water quality 
mitigation plans, including costs for remediation.
(7)  Estimated costs for nonstructural safety concerns 
such as the need for secure vestibules, escape routes, 
recessed doors and other design features that would reduce 
the possibility of or the severity of a violent incident.
(8)  Evidence of compliance with 35 Pa.C.S. ยง 7701 
(relating to duties concerning disaster prevention). A copy 
of an "All-Hazards" plan may be used to satisfy the 
requirements of this paragraph.
(d)  Duty of school entities.--By October 1, 2026, and every 
seven years thereafter, a school entity shall submit a 
facilities condition assessment to the department. The 
assessment may be conducted by an individual with professional 
qualifications and experience in architecture, engineering, 
construction or facilities management.
(e)  Effect of failure to comply.--A school entity that fails 
20250SB0084PN0039 	- 4 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30 under subsection (d) to submit a complete facilities condition 
assessment to the department shall disqualify the school entity 
from being eligible for a grant under section 1753.2-E of the 
act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal 
Code, or reimbursement under section 2602-J or a grant under 
section 2604-J or 2603-L.
(f)  Public posting of assessments.--The department shall 
post a list of school entities that have submitted a completed 
facility condition assessment on the department's publicly 
accessible Internet website.
(g)  Definitions.--As used in this section, the following 
words and phrases shall have the meanings given to them in this 
subsection unless the context clearly indicates otherwise:
"School entity."    A school district, intermediate unit, area  
career and technical school, charter school or regional charter 
school.
Section 3.  This act shall take effect immediately.
20250SB0084PN0039 	- 5 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17