PRINTER'S NO. 127 THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA SENATE RESOLUTION No.12 Session of 2025 INTRODUCED BY COSTA, JANUARY 27, 2025 INTRODUCED AND ADOPTED, JANUARY 27, 2025 A RESOLUTION Honoring the life and achievements of former President Jimmy Carter, the 39th President of the United States. WHEREAS, James Earl "Jimmy" Carter, Jr., was born October 1, 1924, in Plains, Georgia, to James Earl Carter, Sr., a farmer and businessman, and Lillian Gordy Carter, a nurse; and WHEREAS, Before entering politics, Mr. Carter graduated with distinction from the United States Naval Academy in 1946; and WHEREAS, Mr. Carter became a submariner and eventually earned the rank of lieutenant in the United States Navy; and WHEREAS, After serving on several county boards in his home state, Mr. Carter was elected to the Georgia State Senate in 1962; and WHEREAS, Mr. Carter was sworn in as Georgia's 76th governor on January 12, 1971; and WHEREAS, Mr. Carter announced his candidacy for President on December 12, 1974; and WHEREAS, Mr. Carter's term as President from January 20, 1977, through January 20, 1981, began a legacy dedicated to 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 peace, humanitarianism and compassion; and WHEREAS, Mr. Carter achieved many foreign policy accomplishments, including the Camp David Accords, which enabled a peace treaty between Egypt and Israel, and the SALT II treaty, a nuclear arms agreement between the United States and the Soviet Union; and WHEREAS, Domestically, Mr. Carter expanded the National Park System, created the United States Department of Education and the United States Department of Energy and signed the Full Employment and Balanced Growth Act of 1978, or Humphrey-Hawkins Act, which specified low unemployment and inflation goals for the United States; and WHEREAS, After leaving office in 1981, Mr. Carter created a nonprofit, The Carter Center, with his wife, Rosalynn Carter, in a continuing effort to fight for human rights and democracy across the globe; and WHEREAS, Based in Atlanta, The Carter Center has led countless international campaigns to eradicate diseases, reduce hunger and mediate conflicts since 1982; and WHEREAS, Mr. Carter authored dozens of books and spent decades volunteering for Habitat for Humanity, helping to build or repair homes for persons in need while advocating for affordable housing; and WHEREAS, Mr. Carter even worked with Habitat for Humanity in the City of Philadelphia, where in 1988 he and other volunteers built homes on the 1900 block of West Wilt Street; and WHEREAS, Beyond his legacy as a distinguished humanitarian and dedicated volunteer, Mr. Carter was recognized as a recipient of The Nobel Peace Prize; and WHEREAS, The Nobel Prize organization awarded Mr. Carter the 20250SR0012PN0127 - 2 - 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 honor in 2002 "for his decades of untiring effort to find peaceful solutions to international conflicts, to advance democracy and human rights, and to promote economic and social development"; and WHEREAS, Mr. Carter died at his home in Georgia on December 29, 2024, at 100 years of age, making him the oldest-living President in our nation's history; therefore be it RESOLVED, That the Senate of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania honor the life and achievements of former President Jimmy Carter and extend condolences to his family, friends and admirers; and be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this resolution be transmitted to the Carter Family in care of The Carter Center, 453 John Lewis Freedom Parkway NE, Atlanta, GA 30307. 20250SR0012PN0127 - 3 - 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14