Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session

Pennsylvania Senate Bill SR15 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                             
PRINTER'S NO. 162 
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF PENNSYLVANIA
SENATE RESOLUTION 
No.15 
Session of 
2025 
INTRODUCED BY PHILLIPS-HILL, PITTMAN, KEEFER, BROOKS, ROTHMAN, 
MARTIN, FONTANA, PENNYCUICK, BAKER, CULVER, TARTAGLIONE, 
KANE, STEFANO, J. WARD, DUSH AND MASTRIANO, FEBRUARY 3, 2025 
REFERRED TO RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS, FEBRUARY 3, 2025 
A RESOLUTION
Designating February 3, 2025, as "Four Chaplains Day" in 
Pennsylvania.
WHEREAS, On January 11, 1943, the United States Army 
Transport Dorchester sailed from New York to Greenland carrying 
more than 900 soldiers, merchant marines and civilian support 
forces; and
WHEREAS, Shortly after midnight on February 3, 1943, the 
Dorchester was struck by a torpedo fired without warning from a 
German U-boat patrolling the North Atlantic, instantly killing 
100 men and cutting off power and radio communication with 
escort ships; and
WHEREAS, In the 20 minutes before the ship sank, four Army 
chaplains, Lieutenants George L. Fox (Methodist), Alexander D. 
Goode (Jewish), John P. Washington (Roman Catholic) and Clark V. 
Poling (Dutch Reformed), comforted the dying, encouraged the 
living, guided survivors to lifeboats and gave up their own life 
jackets to men who had none, sacrificing their own lives for 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17 those of their spiritual charges; and
WHEREAS, Because the four chaplains were technically 
ineligible for the Medal of Honor, the Congress of the United 
States authorized a onetime posthumous Special Medal for Heroism 
which was presented to the four chaplains' next of kin on 
January 18, 1961, in addition to the Purple Hearts and 
Distinguished Service Crosses already awarded to them; and
WHEREAS, The Four Chaplains Memorial Foundation, located in 
Philadelphia, continues to honor their peerless legacy by 
recognizing residents who perform exemplary service to their 
communities; and
WHEREAS, Lieutenant Goode will always be remembered in York 
County, where an elementary school in the York City School 
District proudly bears his name to honor his valor and 
sacrifice; and
WHEREAS, In 2025, the Four Chaplains Memorial of York County 
organization will hold its annual anniversary gathering to honor 
the legacy of the Four Chaplains; therefore be it
RESOLVED, That the Senate designate February 3, 2025, as 
"Four Chaplains Day" in Pennsylvania; and be it further
RESOLVED, That the Senate honor the sacrifice and inspiring 
selflessness of Lieutenants Fox, Goode, Washington and Poling.
20250SR0015PN0162 	- 2 - 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22