LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
Profiles
Elizabeth Warren
Calendar
US Senator
Elizabeth Warren
D
Overview
Biography
Curriculum Vitae
Legislative Session Info
Activity Timeline
Bill Author / Sponsor
Committee Membership
Meeting Calendar
Staff Directory
US Senator
Elizabeth Warren
Calendar
Session
2025-2026 Regular Session
2023-2024 Regular Session
2021-2022 Regular Session
2019-2020 Regular Session
2017-2018 Regular Session
2015-2016 Regular Session
2013-2014 Regular Session
Date
Event
Location
05/01/2025
9:00 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
04/30/2025
2:30 pm
Aging (Special) Committee
04/30/2025
9:00 am
Finance Committee
04/29/2025
9:00 am
Finance Committee
04/10/2025
9:10 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
04/10/2025
9:00 am
Finance Committee
04/09/2025
1:30 pm
Aging (Special) Committee
04/08/2025
9:00 am
Finance Committee
04/03/2025
9:00 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
04/02/2025
1:15 pm
Finance Committee
03/31/2025
11:00 pm
Finance Committee
03/27/2025
9:00 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
03/25/2025
9:10 am
Finance Committee
03/25/2025
8:30 am
Finance Committee
03/14/2025
9:00 am
Finance Committee
03/13/2025
9:00 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
SB875
Last Action: Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 32.
03/12/2025
2:30 pm
Aging (Special) Committee
03/12/2025
9:00 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
03/12/2025
9:00 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
03/06/2025
10:00 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
03/06/2025
9:00 am
Finance Committee
02/27/2025
9:00 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
02/26/2025
2:30 pm
Aging (Special) Committee
02/26/2025
1:30 pm
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Digital Assets
02/12/2025
2:30 pm
Aging (Special) Committee
02/12/2025
10:00 am
Finance Committee
02/11/2025
9:00 am
Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Committee
SB257
Last Action: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
02/10/2025
11:00 pm
Finance Committee
02/06/2025
9:00 am
Finance Committee
02/06/2025
8:50 am
Finance Committee