Senate | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Senate Education | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/18/2023) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2023) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2023) | ||
House | 01/06/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Education |