Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5013 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/06/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5013 
======== 
LC000442 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- PHYSICAL THERAPISTS 
Introduced By: Representatives Bennett, Baginski, McGaw, Fenton-Fung, McNamara, 
Corvese, and Solomon 
Date Introduced: January 06, 2023 
Referred To: House Health & Human Services 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 5-40-23 of the General Laws in Chapter 5-40 entitled "Physical 1 
Therapists" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
5-40-23. Ordering diagnostic imaging — Sunset. 3 
(a) Physical therapists licensed pursuant to § 5-40-7 may order diagnostic imaging as 4 
defined in § 5-40-1 to be performed and interpreted by other licensed healthcare professionals. 5 
(b) All diagnostic imaging tests ordered by a physical therapist shall be reported by the 6 
physical therapist to the patient’s designated primary care physician of record within seven (7) days 7 
following receipt of the results. This reporting shall not be required if the patient does not have a 8 
primary care physician. 9 
(c) Managed healthcare plans shall provide a utilization report to the general assembly no 10 
later than September 1, 2022, and annually thereafter. 11 
(d) Unless extended by the general assembly, physical therapists shall not be authorized to 12 
order diagnostic imaging as an authorized practice of physical therapy after December 31, 2023 13 
December 31, 2025. 14 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 15 
======== 
LC000442 
========  
 
 
LC000442 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- PHYSICAL THERAPISTS 
***
This act would prohibit physical therapists from ordering diagnostic imaging as an 1 
authorized practice of physical therapy after December 31, 2025. 2 
This act would take effect upon passage. 3 
======== 
LC000442 
========