Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/20/2023) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2023) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023) | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |