Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5135 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- H 5135
66 ========
77 LC000642
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N
1515 AMENDING THE RULES O F THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE YEARS
1616 2021 AND 2022
1717 Introduced By: Representatives Newberry, and Place
1818 Date Introduced: January 13, 2023
1919 Referred To: House Rules
2020
2121
2222 RESOLVED, That section (7) of the rules for the House of Representatives adopted by 1
2323 the House of Representatives at its January session A.D. 2021 entitled "House Resolution 2
2424 Adopting the Rules of the House of Representatives for the years 2021 and 2022", be and the 3
2525 same hereby amended to read as follows: 4
2626 Rules Pertaining to the Order of Business 5
2727 (7)(a) The Speaker, or the Speaker’s designee, shall prepare the floor calendar for each 6
2828 legislative day. The calendar shall be printed or made available electronically to the members 7
2929 daily. During the legislative session, the House shall convene at 4 p.m. provided that the Speaker, 8
3030 with adequate notice to the members, may convene the House at another time. 9
3131 (b) At the commencement of each day's session the roll shall be called or taken by use of 10
3232 the electronic voting system. If a quorum is determined to be present the Speaker shall seek 11
3333 approval of the previous day’s journal and thereafter proceed to business. The order of business, 12
3434 unless the Speaker determines otherwise, shall be as follows: 13
3535 (i) Reports of standing and select committees. 14
3636 (ii) Introduction and reference of new business. 15
3737 (iii) Communications, including communications from the Senate. 16
3838 (iv) Unfinished business in which the House was engaged at the time of last adjournment. 17
3939 (v) Consent calendar. 18
4040 (vi) Calendar. 19
4141
4242
4343 LC000642 - Page 2 of 4
4444 (vii) Introduction of guests and announcements. 1
4545 (viii) Matters of personal privilege. 2
4646 (ix) Recess or adjournment. 3
4747 (c) A representative desiring to introduce a bill or resolution shall file the same with the 4
4848 Clerk of the House. At the request of any representative, an announcement presented to the 5
4949 Speaker may be placed directly in the House Journal noting his or her absence from session. The 6
5050 Speaker, in his or her discretion, may authorize the use of electronic signatures to facilitate the 7
5151 legislative process. If the Speaker authorizes the utilization of electronic signatures by members, 8
5252 the following shall apply: 9
5353 (i) Members shall be provided the option to utilize electronic signatures only by means of 10
5454 a secure electronic signature procedure provided by the Speaker to the members; 11
5555 (ii) An electronic signature executed pursuant to this rule shall be deemed and interpreted 12
5656 as the member’s legal and binding signature; 13
5757 (iii) Only a member of the House may execute an electronic signature pursuant to this 14
5858 rule. A member shall be strictly prohibited to request or permit another person to execute an 15
5959 electronic signature on his or her behalf. 16
6060 (d) All bills and resolutions shall be filed no later than February 11, 2021 (for the 2021 17
6161 session) and February 10, 2022 (for the 2022 session). The provisions of this section shall not 18
6262 apply to city or town bills, to bills for the reinstatement of corporate charters, to bills relating to 19
6363 the solemnization of marriages, appropriations and budget bills, or to bills to create or extend the 20
6464 reporting dates of study commissions. Further, a member may introduce a public bill or resolution 21
6565 after this date in February if one day previous to such introduction, the member shall have 22
6666 notified the House of his or her intention to introduce such bill or resolution by reading the title 23
6767 and giving a brief explanation of its purpose. A member may avail himself or herself of the 24
6868 opportunity afforded by this rule three (3) times only in each calendar year, but in no event after 25
6969 the fortieth (40
7070 th
7171 ) legislative day unless the matter is submitted with the approval of the Speaker. 26
7272 House Committees may, but shall not be obligated to, hear and consider public bills or resolutions 27
7373 approved for introduction pursuant to this rule. 28
7474 (e) Any bill or resolution introduced on or before April 13, 2021 (for the 2021 session) 29
7575 and on or before April 12, 2022 (for the 2022 session): 30
7676 (i) if filed after the convening of the session, shall be in order for the first reading and 31
7777 where appropriate, assignment to committee, as early as the next legislative day and shall be 32
7878 considered a part of the days business, provided that the Speaker may direct that any given 33
7979 measure may be treated in accord with subparagraph (ii) below, and 34
8080
8181
8282 LC000642 - Page 3 of 4
8383 (ii) if filed prior to the convening of the session in the instance where the desk has been 1
8484 left open to receive matters, shall be in order for the first reading and, where appropriate, 2
8585 assignment to committee, as early as that day. 3
8686 (iii) All bills or resolutions introduced after April 13, 2021 (for the 2021 session) and 4
8787 after April 12, 2022 (for the 2022 session) shall be in order for the first reading and, may be 5
8888 assigned to committee, as early as the day of introduction. 6
8989 (iv) In the discretion of the Speaker, any bill filed after the convening of the session on 7
9090 the last legislative day of any week shall also be in order for the first reading as early as the next 8
9191 day and assigned to committee as if the desk were left open. 9
9292 (f) The Clerk of the House shall cause the title and numbers of all bills and resolutions 10
9393 introduced, along with the names of up to ten (10) co-sponsors, to be published in the House 11
9494 Journal for the day on which said bill or resolution is deemed, as herein provided, to have been 12
9595 introduced. 13
9696 (g) Whenever a member has requested that the text of a resolution be read into the House 14
9797 Journal, the Speaker may, at his or her discretion, comply with the request and have the resolution 15
9898 read either during a recess, while the House is at ease or following adjournment. The decorum of 16
9999 the House shall be maintained throughout the requested reading of the resolution. 17
100100 (h) The Clerk of the House shall prepare and publish in the House Journal an index of all 18
101101 rulings made by the Speaker. The index shall contain the question decided by the Speaker, the 19
102102 reasons assigned by the Speaker for his rulings which were appealed, the final vote of the House 20
103103 members with respect to each appeal, and the date of the ruling and vote. 21
104104 ========
105105 LC000642
106106 ========
107107
108108
109109 LC000642 - Page 4 of 4
110110 EXPLANATION
111111 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
112112 OF
113113 H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N
114114 AMENDING THE RULES O F THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES FOR THE YEARS
115115 2021 AND 2022
116116 ***
117117 This resolution would require the Clerk of the House to prepare and publish in the House 1
118118 Journal an index of all rulings made by the Speaker. 2
119119 ========
120120 LC000642
121121 ========