House | 06/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/09/2023) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (02/28/2023) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2023) | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |