1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 5231 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC000858 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
15 | 15 | | EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL |
---|
16 | 16 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, |
---|
17 | 17 | | PRESERVATION, DEVELO PMENT, HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULAT ION |
---|
18 | 18 | | Introduced By: Representatives Shekarchi, and Blazejewski |
---|
19 | 19 | | Date Introduced: January 25, 2023 |
---|
20 | 20 | | Referred To: House Municipal Government & Housing |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 139 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 25, 2021, entitled "HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | DEVELOPMENT, HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULATION" and as extended by 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | resolution No. 194 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | approved March 24, 2022, entitled "HOUSE RESOLUTION EXTENDING THE REPORTING 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT, HOUSING, 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULATION" is hereby authorized to continue its study and make a 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | report to the House of Representatives on or before April 30, 2025, and said commission shall 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | expire on June 30, 2025; and be it further 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 139 passed by the 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 25, 2021, and 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | extended by resolution No. 194 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | A.D. 2022, and approved March 24, 2022, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | ======== |
---|
40 | 40 | | LC000858 |
---|
41 | 41 | | ======== |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | LC000858 - Page 2 of 2 |
---|
45 | 45 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
46 | 46 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
47 | 47 | | OF |
---|
48 | 48 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
49 | 49 | | EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL |
---|
50 | 50 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE ENTIRE AREA OF LAND USE, |
---|
51 | 51 | | PRESERVATION, DEVELO PMENT, HOUSING, ENVIRONMENT, AND REGULAT ION |
---|
52 | 52 | | *** |
---|
53 | 53 | | This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the special legislative 1 |
---|
54 | 54 | | commission to study the entire area of land use, preservation, development, housing, 2 |
---|
55 | 55 | | environment, and regulation, from June 8, 2023, to April 30, 2025, and said commission would 3 |
---|
56 | 56 | | expire on June 30, 2025. 4 |
---|
57 | 57 | | ======== |
---|
58 | 58 | | LC000858 |
---|
59 | 59 | | ======== |
---|