House | 03/30/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/28/2023) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/07/2023) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2023) | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |