House | 06/12/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2023) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2023) | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |