1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 5280 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC000640 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO AERONAUT ICS -- THE PERMANENT AIR QUALITY MONITORING ACT |
---|
16 | 16 | | Introduced By: Representatives McNamara, Solomon, Bennett, Vella-Wilkinson, and |
---|
17 | 17 | | Shanley |
---|
18 | 18 | | Date Introduced: February 01, 2023 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Referred To: House Environment and Natural Resources |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 1. Section 1-7-9 of the General Laws in Chapter 1-7 entitled "The Permanent 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | Air Quality Monitoring Act" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 1-7-9. Monitoring actions required and compliance — Sunset provision. 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | (a) On or before January 31, 2017, and on or before January 31, 2018, and January 31, 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | 2019, thereafter, the department of environmental management, the department of health, and the 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | attorney general shall submit to the governor, the speaker of the house, and the president of the 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | senate, recommendations as to the continuation of the air monitoring required in this act. 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | (b) Unless extended by the general assembly, the corporation’s obligation to operate and 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | maintain the air monitoring system will cease on July 31, 2023; provided, this sunset date shall be 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | dependent upon the corporation undertaking and completing the following actions prior to July 31, 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | 2023 five (5) years after the completion of the freight terminal construction: 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | (1) As part of the long-term air-quality monitoring program, ambient air-quality monitors 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | shall be set up in a network that shall include at least four (4) monitoring sites in the area of and 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | surrounding Rhode Island T.F. Green International Airport. These monitors shall be designed, 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | placed, and maintained so as to measure air-quality impacts from airport operations, including those 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | impacts associated with planes operating on the extended runway and on neighborhoods adjacent 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | to the airport facility, and at the Winslow Park playing fields. In addition to the quarterly summary 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | reports prepared by the corporation based on this data, the corporation shall compile at least twenty 18 |
---|
41 | 41 | | (20) months of complete air quality monitoring data from these monitors and submit that data to 19 |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | LC000640 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
45 | 45 | | the department of health prior to May 1, 2023, pursuant to § 1-7-6; and 1 |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2) The corporation shall comply with all other reporting and publishing requirements set 2 |
---|
47 | 47 | | forth in this chapter. 3 |
---|
48 | 48 | | (c) The corporation shall provide long-term air quality monitoring for the areas surrounding 4 |
---|
49 | 49 | | the Rhode Island T.F. Green International Airport for an additional five (5) years after the 5 |
---|
50 | 50 | | completion of the freight terminal. 6 |
---|
51 | 51 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 7 |
---|
52 | 52 | | ======== |
---|
53 | 53 | | LC000640 |
---|
54 | 54 | | ======== |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | LC000640 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
58 | 58 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
59 | 59 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
60 | 60 | | OF |
---|
61 | 61 | | A N A C T |
---|
62 | 62 | | RELATING TO AERONAUT ICS -- THE PERMANENT AIR QUALITY MONITORING ACT |
---|
63 | 63 | | *** |
---|
64 | 64 | | This act would mandate an additional five (5) year period of air quality monitoring, after 1 |
---|
65 | 65 | | completion of the freight terminal, of the area surrounding the Rhode Island T.F. Green 2 |
---|
66 | 66 | | International Airport. 3 |
---|
67 | 67 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 4 |
---|
68 | 68 | | ======== |
---|
69 | 69 | | LC000640 |
---|
70 | 70 | | ======== |
---|