House | 04/07/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/04/2023) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/02/2023) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (02/16/2023) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2023) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |