House | 06/12/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for reconsideration (05/23/2023) | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2023) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2023) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |