House | 05/01/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/25/2023) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/07/2023) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/01/2023) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2023) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |