Senate | 06/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/27/2023) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/18/2023) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2023) | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |