Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Commerce | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/21/2023) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/08/2023) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023) | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |