Senate | 06/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/16/2023 | House passed as amended in concurrence | ||
House | 06/16/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Education | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | House passed as amended (floor amendment) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/06/2023) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/22/2023) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Education |