1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 5346 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC001161 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION |
---|
16 | 16 | | Introduced By: Representatives Sanchez, Giraldo, Alzate, Kislak, and Biah |
---|
17 | 17 | | Date Introduced: February 03, 2023 |
---|
18 | 18 | | Referred To: House Health & Human Services |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 1. Section 39-1-27.12 of the General Laws in Chapter 39-1 entitled "Public 1 |
---|
23 | 23 | | Utilities Commission" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 |
---|
24 | 24 | | 39-1-27.12. Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program Enhancement Plan. 3 |
---|
25 | 25 | | (a) The Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program Enhancement Plan (hereinafter 4 |
---|
26 | 26 | | “LIHEAP Enhancement Plan”) is hereby created to supplement the federal Low Income Home 5 |
---|
27 | 27 | | Energy Assistance Program (“LIHEAP”) funding being received by customers of Rhode Island 6 |
---|
28 | 28 | | electric and gas distribution companies. 7 |
---|
29 | 29 | | (b) Within a period of time sufficient to accomplish the purposes of this section, but not 8 |
---|
30 | 30 | | longer than ninety (90) days after the effective date of this chapter, the department of human 9 |
---|
31 | 31 | | services shall develop a recommended monthly “LIHEAP enhancement charge” rate for the 10 |
---|
32 | 32 | | following year and make a filing with the commission pursuant to this chapter recommending rates. 11 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Thereafter annually, but no later than October 15 of each year, the department shall make filings 12 |
---|
34 | 34 | | with the commission to recommend the LIHEAP enhancement charge rates for each class of 13 |
---|
35 | 35 | | electric and natural gas distribution company customer for the following year. 14 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (c) A LIHEAP enhancement charge approved by the commission shall have the following 15 |
---|
37 | 37 | | limitations: 16 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) For electric distribution company customers, the charge shall not be more than ten 17 |
---|
39 | 39 | | dollars ($10.00) per year. 18 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (2) For natural gas distribution company customers, the charge shall not be more than ten 19 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LC001161 - Page 2 of 4 |
---|
44 | 44 | | dollars ($10.00) per year. 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | (3) The total projected annual revenue for the LIHEAP enhancement plan through charges 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | to all electric and natural gas distribution company customers shall not exceed seven million five 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | hundred thousand dollars ($7,500,000) and shall not be below six million five hundred thousand 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | dollars ($6,500,000). 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | A minimum of five percent (5%) shall be allocated to provide assistance to customers who 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | are seeking LIHEAP certification for the sole purpose of entering into an arrearage plan as defined 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | in § 39-2-1(d)(2) between April 15 and September 30 of each year. Such customers must be a 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | homeless family or individual transitioning from a shelter into housing and who have provided 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | documentation acceptable to the department of human services. Any funds remaining at the end of 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | the fiscal year shall be available for the upcoming winter season. 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | (d) The commission shall open a docket, to consider for approval, LIHEAP enhancement 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | charge rates proposed by the department. In reviewing the recommended rates, the commission 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | shall give due consideration to the recommendations of the department and the standards set forth 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | in subsection (c). The commission shall issue a decision within sixty (60) days after said 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | recommendations and report are filed with the commission establishing the enhancement plan 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | charge rates. 17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | (e) The electric or gas distribution company shall use the funds collected through this 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | enhancement plan charge to provide a credit to customers’ accounts that are receiving federal 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | LIHEAP assistance payments in a manner determined by the department of human services. The 20 |
---|
64 | 64 | | department of human services shall designate to the gas- or electric distribution company the 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | qualifying customer accounts and the amounts to be credited to those customer accounts, provided 22 |
---|
66 | 66 | | that the total amount to be credited to those accounts shall be fully funded by, and not exceed, the 23 |
---|
67 | 67 | | total amount collected through the enhancement plan charge. The electric or gas distribution 24 |
---|
68 | 68 | | company’s added administrative expenses to process the credit assignments provided to it by the 25 |
---|
69 | 69 | | department of human services will be recoverable either from the LIHEAP enhancement charge or 26 |
---|
70 | 70 | | through a separate charge approved by the public utilities commission. 27 |
---|
71 | 71 | | (f) As used in this section, “electric and natural gas distribution company” means a 28 |
---|
72 | 72 | | company as defined in § 39-1-2(a)(12), but not including the Block Island Power Company or the 29 |
---|
73 | 73 | | Pascoag Utility District. 30 |
---|
74 | 74 | | (g)(1) Pilot program. Commencing July 1, 2023, the public utilities commission in 31 |
---|
75 | 75 | | conjunction with the department of human services shall establish an outreach pilot program to 32 |
---|
76 | 76 | | low-income residents eligible for but not enrolled as a member of LIHEAP for the purpose of 33 |
---|
77 | 77 | | increasing enrollment in the program. The pilot program shall be funded by appropriation of funds 34 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | LC001161 - Page 3 of 4 |
---|
81 | 81 | | by the general assembly and shall be subject to oversight and audit by the department. 1 |
---|
82 | 82 | | (2) No later than December 1, 2023, the department shall file a written report to the 2 |
---|
83 | 83 | | governor, the speaker of the house, and the president of the senate regarding the effect and/or 3 |
---|
84 | 84 | | success of the outreach program, and recommendations, if necessary, for additional revenues or 4 |
---|
85 | 85 | | appropriations to fund full participation for qualified applicants. 5 |
---|
86 | 86 | | (3) This section shall sunset on September 1, 2025. 6 |
---|
87 | 87 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 7 |
---|
88 | 88 | | ======== |
---|
89 | 89 | | LC001161 |
---|
90 | 90 | | ======== |
---|
91 | 91 | | |
---|
92 | 92 | | |
---|
93 | 93 | | LC001161 - Page 4 of 4 |
---|
94 | 94 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
95 | 95 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
96 | 96 | | OF |
---|
97 | 97 | | A N A C T |
---|
98 | 98 | | RELATING TO PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION |
---|
99 | 99 | | *** |
---|
100 | 100 | | This act would create a two (2) year pilot program within the public utilities commission 1 |
---|
101 | 101 | | (PUC), in conjunction with the department of human services (DHS), for the purpose of increasing 2 |
---|
102 | 102 | | enrollment of low-income residents to participate in LIHEAP with a report due on December 1, 3 |
---|
103 | 103 | | 2023, on the success of the program and any need for increased funds to the governor, and general 4 |
---|
104 | 104 | | assembly. The program would commence on July 1, 2023, and sunset on July 1, 2025. 5 |
---|
105 | 105 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 6 |
---|
106 | 106 | | ======== |
---|
107 | 107 | | LC001161 |
---|
108 | 108 | | ======== |
---|