Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Labor | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2023) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/20/2023) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2023) | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Labor |