House | 05/18/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/16/2023) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/18/2023) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/15/2023) | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |