1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 5403 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC001106 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIRMENT SYSTEM - |
---|
16 | 16 | | CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS |
---|
17 | 17 | | Introduced By: Representatives Quattrocchi, and Nardone |
---|
18 | 18 | | Date Introduced: February 03, 2023 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Referred To: House Finance |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 1. Section 36-10-9.2 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10 entitled "Retirement 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | System — Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 36-10-9.2. Retirement on service allowance — Correctional officers. 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | (a) This section shall apply to the retirement of members employed as assistant director 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (adult services), assistant deputy director, chief of inspection, and associate directors, correctional 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | officer, chief of security, administrator of community confinement, home confinement coordinator, 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | work rehabilitation program supervisor, supervisor of custodial records and reports, and 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | classification counselor within the department of corrections. 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | (b)(1) Any member who has attained the age of fifty (50) years may be retired subsequent 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | to the proper execution and filing of a written application; provided, however, that the member 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | shall have completed twenty (20) years of total service within the department of corrections and 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | who retires before October 1, 2009, or is eligible to retire as of September 30, 2009. 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) For members who become eligible to retire on or after October 1, 2009, benefits are 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | available to members who have attained the age of fifty-five (55) and have completed at least 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | twenty-five (25) years of total contributory service within the department of corrections. For 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | members in service as of October 1, 2009, who were not eligible to retire as of September 30, 2009, 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | but who are eligible to retire on or prior to June 30, 2012, the minimum retirement age of fifty-five 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (55) will be adjusted downward in proportion to the amount of service the member has earned as 18 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LC001106 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
44 | 44 | | of September 30, 2009. The proportional formula shall work as follows: 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | (i) The formula shall determine the first age of retirement eligibility under the laws in effect 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | on September 30, 2009, which shall then be subtracted from the minimum retirement age of fifty-3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | five (55). 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | (ii) The formula shall then take the member’s total service credit as of September 30, 2009, 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | as the numerator and the years of service credit determined under (b)(2)(i) as the denominator. 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | (iii) The fraction determined in (b)(2)(ii) shall then be multiplied by the age difference 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | determined in (b)(2)(i) to apply a reduction in years from age fifty-five (55). 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | (c) Any member with contributory service on or after July 1, 2012, who has completed at 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | least five (5) years of contributory service but who has not completed twenty-five (25) years of 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | contributory service, shall be eligible to retire upon the attainment of the member’s Social Security 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | retirement age or, notwithstanding any other provisions, effective July 1, 2015, members in active 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | service shall be eligible to retire upon the earlier of: 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | (1) The attainment of at least age sixty-five (65) and the completion of at least thirty (30) 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | years of total service, or the attainment of at least age sixty-four (64) and the completion of at least 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | thirty-one (31) years of total service, or the attainment of at least age sixty-three (63) and the 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | completion of at least thirty-two (32) years of total service, or the attainment of at least age sixty-17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | two (62) and the completion of at least thirty-three (33) years of total service; or 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | (2) The member’s retirement eligibility date under § 36-10-9(1)(c)(ii). 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | (d) Any member who shall have rendered service both as a state employee under § 36-10-20 |
---|
64 | 64 | | 9, and service under subsection (a) of this section, shall be eligible to elect to combine the member’s 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | service under subsection (a) of this section and service under § 36-10-9 to determine the member’s 22 |
---|
66 | 66 | | retirement eligibility date under § 36-10-9. For any member making this election, the member will 23 |
---|
67 | 67 | | receive a single benefit equal to the accrued benefit computed under § 36-10-10.2, plus the accrued 24 |
---|
68 | 68 | | benefit computed under § 36-10-10. 25 |
---|
69 | 69 | | (e) The provisions of subsection (d) shall also apply to members who have retired on a 26 |
---|
70 | 70 | | service retirement allowance on or after July 1, 2012. Any such request for adjustment shall be in 27 |
---|
71 | 71 | | writing to the retirement board and shall apply prospectively from the date the request is received 28 |
---|
72 | 72 | | by the retirement board. 29 |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 30 |
---|
74 | 74 | | ======== |
---|
75 | 75 | | LC001106 |
---|
76 | 76 | | ======== |
---|
77 | 77 | | |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | LC001106 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
80 | 80 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
81 | 81 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
82 | 82 | | OF |
---|
83 | 83 | | A N A C T |
---|
84 | 84 | | RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIRMENT SYSTEM - |
---|
85 | 85 | | CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS |
---|
86 | 86 | | *** |
---|
87 | 87 | | This act would add the administrator of community confinement and the home confinement 1 |
---|
88 | 88 | | coordinator in the state retirement system. 2 |
---|
89 | 89 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 3 |
---|
90 | 90 | | ======== |
---|
91 | 91 | | LC001106 |
---|
92 | 92 | | ======== |
---|