Senate | 06/14/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/28/2023) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2023) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |