House | 06/21/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2023) | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2023) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |