House | 06/20/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2023) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2023) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/01/2023) | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Labor |