House | 05/10/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/09/2023) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/25/2023) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/19/2023) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2023) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |