Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5641 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- H 5641
66 ========
77 LC001378
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM
1616 CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS
1717 Introduced By: Representatives O'Brien, Dawson, Noret, McEntee, Serpa, Cardillo,
1818 Azzinaro, Edwards, and Solomon
1919 Date Introduced: February 15, 2023
2020 Referred To: House Finance
2121
2222
2323 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2424 SECTION 1. Section 36-10-1 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10 entitled "Retirement 1
2525 System — Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2626 36-10-1. Member contributions — Deduction from compensation. 3
2727 (a)(1) Prior to July 1, 2012, each member of the retirement system shall contribute an 4
2828 amount equal to eight and three-quarters percent (8.75%) of his or her compensation as his or her 5
2929 share of the cost of annuities, benefits, and allowances. Effective July 1, 2012, each member of the 6
3030 retirement system shall contribute an amount equal to three and three quarters percent (3.75%) of 7
3131 his or her compensation, except for correctional officers as defined in § 36-10-9.2 who shall 8
3232 contribute an amount equal to eight and three quarters percent (8.75%) of his or her compensation. 9
3333 Effective July 1, 2015, each member of the retirement system, except for correctional officers as 10
3434 defined in § 36-10-9.2, with twenty (20) or more years of total service as of June 30, 2012 shall 11
3535 contribute an amount equal to eleven percent (11%) of compensation. 12
3636 (2) Effective July 1, 2023, those members of the retirement system who are state employees 13
3737 employed as deputy sheriffs, capitol police officers, environmental police officers, juvenile 14
3838 program workers, shift coordinators, firefighters, crew chiefs, assistant chiefs, fire investigators, 15
3939 fire safety inspectors, fire safety training officers, explosives and flammable liquids technicians, 16
4040 and campus police officers employed by the state of Rhode Island and executive military staff shall 17
4141 contribute an amount equal to ten percent (10%) of compensation. 18
4242
4343
4444 LC001378 - Page 2 of 4
4545 (3) The contributions shall be made in the form of deductions from compensation. 1
4646 (b) The deductions provided for herein shall be made notwithstanding that the minimum 2
4747 compensation provided by law for any member shall be reduced thereby. Every member shall be 3
4848 deemed to consent and agree to the deductions made and provided for herein and receipt of his or 4
4949 her full compensation and payment of compensation, less the deductions, shall be a full and 5
5050 complete discharge and acquittance of all claims and demands whatsoever for the services rendered 6
5151 by the person during the period covered by the payment except as to the benefit provided under this 7
5252 chapter. 8
5353 SECTION 2. Section 36-10.3-1 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10.3 entitled "Defined 9
5454 Contribution Retirement Plan" is hereby amended to read as follows: 10
5555 36-10.3-1. Definitions. 11
5656 As used in this chapter, the following terms, unless the context requires a different 12
5757 interpretation, shall have the following meanings: 13
5858 (1) “Compensation” means compensation as defined in § 36-8-1(8). 14
5959 (2) “Employee” means an employee as defined in §§ 36-8-1(9) and 45-21-2(7) and a 15
6060 teacher as defined in § 16-16-1(12), effective July 1, 2012; provided however, effective July 1, 16
6161 2015, “employee” shall not include any employee with twenty (20) or more years of total service 17
6262 as of June 30, 2012, in the employees retirement system under chapters 8 through 10 of title 36 or 18
6363 chapter 16 of title 16 (ERS), or the municipal employees retirement system under chapter 21 of 19
6464 title 45 (MERS); provided, however, effective July 1, 2023, "employee" shall not include deputy 20
6565 sheriffs, capitol police officers, environmental police officers, juvenile program workers, shift 21
6666 coordinators, firefighters, crew chiefs, assistant chiefs, fire investigators, fire safety inspectors, fire 22
6767 safety training officers, explosives and flammable liquids technicians, and campus police officers 23
6868 employed by the state of Rhode Island and executive military staff. 24
6969 (3) “Employer” means the State of Rhode Island or the local municipality which employs 25
7070 a member of the Employees Retirement System under chapters 8 through 10 of title 36 or chapter 26
7171 16 of title 16 (ERS) or the Municipal Employees Retirement System under chapters 21 and 21.2 of 27
7272 title 45 (MERS). 28
7373 (4) “Plan” means the retirement plan established by this chapter. 29
7474 (5) A “public safety member” shall mean a member of MERS who is a municipal fire 30
7575 fighter or a municipal policeman or policewoman as defined in § 45-21.2-2 who does not participate 31
7676 in Social Security under the Federal Old Age, Survivors, and Disability income program. 32
7777 (6) “Regular member” means: 33
7878 (i) An employee who is a member of ERS other than correctional officers as defined in § 34
7979
8080
8181 LC001378 - Page 3 of 4
8282 36-10-9.2; or 1
8383 (ii) An employee who is a member of MERS other than a public safety member. 2
8484 (7) The “retirement board” or “board” shall mean the retirement board of the Employees 3
8585 Retirement System of Rhode Island as defined in chapter 8 of this title. The retirement board shall 4
8686 be the plan administrator and plan trustee and shall administer the plan in accordance with § 36-8-5
8787 4.1. 6
8888 (8) “State investment commission” or “commission” means the state investment 7
8989 commission as defined in § 35-10-1. 8
9090 (9) “Supplemental employer” includes any employer that provides supplemental 9
9191 contributions to the defined contribution retirement plan as provided in § 36-10.3-3. 10
9292 (10) “Supplemental member” is defined in § 36-10.3-3. 11
9393 SECTION 3. Chapter 36-10 of the General Laws entitled "Retirement System-12
9494 Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended by adding thereto the following section: 13
9595 36-10-9.8. Retirement on service allowance -- State law enforcement professionals. 14
9696 (a) Effective July 1, 2023, notwithstanding any special law or general law, rule or 15
9797 regulation to the contrary, state employees employed as deputy sheriffs, capitol police officers, 16
9898 environmental police officers, juvenile program workers, shift coordinators, firefighters, crew 17
9999 chiefs, assistant chiefs, fire investigators, fire safety inspectors, fire safety training officers, 18
100100 explosives and flammable liquids technicians, and campus police officers employed by the state of 19
101101 Rhode Island and executive military staff shall be entitled to the benefits provided by §§ 45-21.2-20
102102 5, 45-21.2-6, 45-21.2-10, 45-21.2-11, 45-21.2-12, and 45-21.2-13. 21
103103 (b) For members identified in subsection (a) of this section, service credits earned prior to 22
104104 July 1, 2023, shall be determined by the laws in effect on June 30, 2023. 23
105105 SECTION 4. This act shall take effect upon passage. 24
106106 ========
107107 LC001378
108108 ========
109109
110110
111111 LC001378 - Page 4 of 4
112112 EXPLANATION
113113 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
114114 OF
115115 A N A C T
116116 RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM
117117 CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS
118118 ***
119119 This act would provide state employee public safety professionals subject to the state 1
120120 retirement system with a position of parity with public safety employees of the municipal retirement 2
121121 system, effective July 1, 2023. The act would set their retirement contribution at ten percent (10%) 3
122122 of their compensation. 4
123123 This act would take effect upon passage. 5
124124 ========
125125 LC001378
126126 ========