Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5695 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/17/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5695 
======== 
LC001142 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- WEAPONS 
Introduced By: Representatives Noret, Hull, Baginski, Vella-Wilkinson, Finkelman, 
Place, Dawson, Azzinaro, Costantino, and Lima 
Date Introduced: February 17, 2023 
Referred To: House Judiciary 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 11-47-17 of the General Laws in Chapter 11-47 entitled "Weapons" 1 
is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
11-47-17. Qualifications required of law enforcement officers appointed after June 3 
17, 1959. 4 
Except as provided in § 11-47-15.3, all law enforcement officers of this state and its 5 
political subdivisions whose permanent appointment shall take place after June 17, 1959, will be 6 
required to qualify with the pistol or revolver with which they are armed prior to their permanent 7 
appointment, that qualification to be the same as that required in § 11-47-15. Town constables or 8 
police constables, special officers, and all law enforcement officers, who by law are authorized to 9 
carry side arms and whose appointments are made on a recurring basis, will be required to qualify 10 
not later than one year following the date of enactment of this section and their commissions or 11 
warrants will be plainly marked or stamped “QUALIFIED WITH PISTOL OR REVOLVER” and 12 
will be signed and dated by the certifying authority attesting to that fact. The failure of any law 13 
enforcement officer to qualify under the provisions of this section revokes his or her privilege of 14 
carrying a pistol or revolver, whether concealed or not, on or about his or her person. All law 15 
enforcement officers of this state and its political subdivisions will repeat this qualification at 16 
periods of not more than one year two (2) times per year at intervals of at least four (4) months, 17 
except for correctional officers who must repeat this qualification one time per year. Provided 18 
further, effective January 1, 2024, the qualification requirements pursuant to this section shall 19   
 
 
LC001142 - Page 2 of 3 
include a nighttime low light/no light qualification component which shall simulate dusk to dawn 1 
lighting conditions which conditions may be artificially produced indoors. 2 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect on July 1, 2023. 3 
======== 
LC001142 
========  
 
 
LC001142 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- WEAPONS 
***
This act would mandate that police officers qualify in the use of firearms two (2) times per 1 
year instead of one time annually and correction officers qualify annually under lowlight/no light 2 
conditions. 3 
This act would take effect on July 1, 2023. 4 
======== 
LC001142 
========