Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2023) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/22/2023) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2023) | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |