Senate | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2023) | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2023) | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/11/2023) | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023) | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |