Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/17/2023) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |