Senate | 06/12/2023 | Meeting postponed (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2023) | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |