House | 05/23/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2023) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/06/2023) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2023) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2023) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |