Senate | 06/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2023) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2023) | ||
House | 02/26/2023 | Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |