Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5789 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- H 5789
66 ========
77 LC002009
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO EDUCATION -- RESIDENCE OF CHILDREN FOR SCHOOL PURPOSES
1616 Introduced By: Representatives Fogarty, Shallcross Smith, Tanzi, Hull, J. Lombardi,
1717 Carson, Spears, Donovan, and McEntee
1818 Date Introduced: February 22, 2023
1919 Referred To: House Finance
2020
2121
2222 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2323 SECTION 1. Section 16-64-1.1 of the General Laws in Chapter 16-64 entitled "Residence 1
2424 of Children for School Purposes" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2525 16-64-1.1. Payment and reimbursement for educational costs of children placed in 3
2626 foster care, group homes, or other residential facility by a Rhode Island state agency. 4
2727 (a) Children placed in foster care by a Rhode Island-licensed child-placing agency or a 5
2828 Rhode Island governmental agency shall be entitled to the same free, appropriate public education 6
2929 provided to all other residents of the city or town where the child is placed. The city or town shall 7
3030 pay the cost of the education of the child during the time the child is in foster care in the city or 8
3131 town. 9
3232 (b) Children placed by the department of children, youth and families (DCYF) in a group 10
3333 home or other residential facility that does not include the delivery of educational services are to 11
3434 be educated by the community in which the group home or other residential facility is located, and 12
3535 those children shall be entitled to the same free, appropriate public education provided to all other 13
3636 residents of the city or town where the child is placed. For purposes of payment and reimbursement 14
3737 for educational costs under this chapter, the term “group home or other residential facility” shall 15
3838 not include independent-living programs. Each city and town that contains one or more group 16
3939 homes or other residential facilities that do not include delivery of educational services will receive 17
4040 funds as part of state aid to education in accordance with the following provisions: 18
4141 (1) On December 31 of each year, the DCYF shall provide the department of elementary 19
4242
4343
4444 LC002009 - Page 2 of 4
4545 and secondary education with a precise count of how many group home or other residential facility 1
4646 “beds” exist in each Rhode Island city or town, counting only those “beds” in facilities that do not 2
4747 include the delivery of educational services. The number of “beds” in each group home or other 3
4848 residential facility shall be equal to the maximum number of children who may be placed in that 4
4949 group home or other residential facility on any given night according to the applicable licensure 5
5050 standards of the DCYF. 6
5151 (2) For the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2007, if the number of beds certified by DCYF for 7
5252 a school district by December 31, 2007, is greater than the number certified March 14, 2007, upon 8
5353 which the education aid for FY 2008 was appropriated, the education aid for that district will be 9
5454 increased by the number of increased beds multiplied by fifteen thousand dollars ($15,000). 10
5555 Notwithstanding the provisions of this section or any law to the contrary, the education aid for all 11
5656 group home or other residential facility “beds” located or associated with the Children’s Residential 12
5757 and Family Treatment (CRAFT) program located on the East Providence campus of Bradley 13
5858 Hospital shall be twenty-two thousand dollars ($22,000) per bed. The Department of Elementary 14
5959 and Secondary Education shall include the additional aid in equal payments in March, April, May, 15
6060 and June, and the Governor’s budget recommendations pursuant to § 35-3-8 shall include the 16
6161 amounts required to provide the increased aid. 17
6262 For all fiscal years beginning after June 30, 2016, education aid for each school district 18
6363 shall include seventeen thousand dollars ($17,000) for each bed certified by DCYF by the preceding 19
6464 December 31. Notwithstanding the provisions of this section or any law to the contrary, the 20
6565 education aid for all group home or other residential facility “beds” located or associated with the 21
6666 Children’s Residential and Family Treatment (CRAFT) program located on the East Providence 22
6767 campus of Bradley Hospital shall be twenty-six thousand dollars ($26,000) per bed. For all fiscal 23
6868 years beginning after June 30, 2008, whenever the number of beds certified by DCYF for a school 24
6969 district by December 31 is greater than the number certified the prior December 31 upon which the 25
7070 education aid for that fiscal year was appropriated, the education aid for that district as enacted by 26
7171 the assembly during the prior legislative session for that fiscal year will be increased by the number 27
7272 of increased beds multiplied by the amount per bed authorized for that fiscal year. The Department 28
7373 of Elementary and Secondary Education shall include the additional aid in equal payments in 29
7474 March, April, May, and June, and the Governor’s budget recommendations pursuant to § 35-3-8 30
7575 shall include the amounts required to provide the increased aid. 31
7676 (c) Children placed by DCYF in a residential-treatment program, group home, or other 32
7777 residential facility, whether or not located in the state of Rhode Island, which includes the delivery 33
7878 of educational services provided by that facility (excluding facilities where students are taught on 34
7979
8080
8181 LC002009 - Page 3 of 4
8282 grounds for periods of time by teaching staff provided by the school district in which the facility is 1
8383 located), shall have the cost of their education paid for as provided for in subsection (d) and § 16-2
8484 64-1.2. The city or town determined to be responsible to DYCF for a per-pupil special-education 3
8585 cost pursuant to § 16-64-1.2 shall pay its share of the cost of educational services to DCYF or to 4
8686 the facility providing educational services. 5
8787 (d) Children placed by DCYF in group homes, child-caring facilities, community 6
8888 residences, or other residential facilities shall have the entire cost of their education paid for by 7
8989 DCYF if: 8
9090 (1) The facility is operated by the state of Rhode Island or the facility has a contract with 9
9191 DCYF to fund a pre-determined number of placements or part of the facility’s program; 10
9292 (2) The facility is state licensed; and 11
9393 (3) The facility operates an approved, on-grounds educational program, whether or not the 12
9494 child attends the on-grounds program. 13
9595 (e) In addition to the provisions of subsection (b) of this section, the department of 14
9696 education, in conjunction with the DCYF, shall develop a procedure to ensure that the 15
9797 municipalities in which group homes or other residential facilities are located are reimbursed for 16
9898 the educational expenses above the cost allocated in this section. Any procedure established shall 17
9999 provide at a minimum that the actual education costs associated with a child placed in a group home 18
100100 or other residential facility is paid by the state through the department of education, the DCYF, or 19
101101 the municipality where the child is a resident pursuant to § 16-64-1. 20
102102 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 21
103103 ========
104104 LC002009
105105 ========
106106
107107
108108 LC002009 - Page 4 of 4
109109 EXPLANATION
110110 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
111111 OF
112112 A N A C T
113113 RELATING TO EDUCATION -- RESIDENCE OF CHILDREN FOR SCHOOL PURPOSES
114114 ***
115115 This act would require the department of education and the DCYF to develop a procedure 1
116116 to ensure that the municipalities where group homes or other residential facilities are located are 2
117117 reimbursed for the educational expenses above the cost allocated. 3
118118 This act would take effect upon passage. 4
119119 ========
120120 LC002009
121121 ========