1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 5793 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC001999 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO EDUCATION -- FOUNDATION LEVEL SCHOOL SUPPORT |
---|
16 | 16 | | Introduced By: Representatives Giraldo, Alzate, Morales, Cruz, and Potter |
---|
17 | 17 | | Date Introduced: February 22, 2023 |
---|
18 | 18 | | Referred To: House Finance |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 1. Section 16-7-41.1 of the General Laws in Chapter 16-7 entitled "Foundation 1 |
---|
23 | 23 | | Level School Support [See Title 16 Chapter 97 — The Rhode Island Board of Education Act]" is 2 |
---|
24 | 24 | | hereby amended to read as follows: 3 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 16-7-41.1. Eligibility for reimbursement. 4 |
---|
26 | 26 | | (a) School districts, not municipalities, may apply for and obtain approval for a project 5 |
---|
27 | 27 | | under the necessity of school construction process set forth in the regulations of the council on 6 |
---|
28 | 28 | | elementary and secondary education, provided, however, in the case of a municipality that issues 7 |
---|
29 | 29 | | bonds through the Rhode Island health and educational building corporation to finance or refinance 8 |
---|
30 | 30 | | school facilities for a school district that is not part of the municipality, the municipality may apply 9 |
---|
31 | 31 | | for and obtain approval for a project. Such approval will remain valid until June 30 of the third 10 |
---|
32 | 32 | | fiscal year following the fiscal year in which the council on elementary and secondary education’s 11 |
---|
33 | 33 | | approval is granted. Only those projects undertaken at school facilities under the care and control 12 |
---|
34 | 34 | | of the school committee and located on school property may qualify for reimbursement under §§ 13 |
---|
35 | 35 | | 16-7-35 — 16-7-47. Facilities with combined school and municipal uses or facilities that are 14 |
---|
36 | 36 | | operated jointly with any other profit or nonprofit agency do not qualify for reimbursement under 15 |
---|
37 | 37 | | §§ 16-7-35 — 16-7-47. Projects completed by June 30 of a fiscal year are eligible for 16 |
---|
38 | 38 | | reimbursement in the following fiscal year. A project for new school housing or additional housing 17 |
---|
39 | 39 | | shall be deemed to be completed when the work has been officially accepted by the school 18 |
---|
40 | 40 | | committee or when the housing is occupied for its intended use by the school committee, whichever 19 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | LC001999 - Page 2 of 4 |
---|
44 | 44 | | is earlier. 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | (b) Notwithstanding the provisions of this section, the board of regents shall not grant final 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | approval for any project between June 30, 2011, and May 1, 2015, except for projects that are 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | necessitated by immediate health and safety reasons. In the event that a project is requested during 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | the moratorium because of immediate health and safety reasons, those proposals shall be reported 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | to the chairs of the house and senate finance committees. 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | (c) Any project approval granted prior to the adoption of the school construction 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | regulations in 2007, and which are currently inactive; and any project approval granted prior to the 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | adoption of the school construction regulations in 2007 which did not receive voter approval or 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | which has not been previously financed, are no longer eligible for reimbursement under this 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | chapter. The department of elementary and secondary education shall develop recommendations 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | for further cost containment strategies in the school housing aid program. 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | (d) Beginning July 1, 2015, the council on elementary and secondary education shall 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | approve new necessity of school construction applications on an annual basis. The department of 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | elementary and secondary education shall develop an annual application timeline for local 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | education agencies seeking new necessity of school construction approvals. 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | (e) Beginning July 1, 2019, no state funding shall be provided for projects in excess of ten 17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | million dollars ($10,000,000) unless the prime contractor for the project has received 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | prequalification from the school building authority. 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | (f) Beginning July 1, 2019, the necessity of school construction process set forth in the 20 |
---|
64 | 64 | | regulations of the council on elementary and secondary education shall include a single statewide 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | process, developed with the consultation of the department of environmental management, that will 22 |
---|
66 | 66 | | ensure community involvement throughout the investigation and remediation of contaminated 23 |
---|
67 | 67 | | building sites for possible reuse as the location of a school. That process will fulfill all provisions 24 |
---|
68 | 68 | | of § 23-19.14-5 related to the investigation of reuse of such sites for schools. 25 |
---|
69 | 69 | | (g) Beginning July 1, 2019, school housing projects exceeding one million five hundred 26 |
---|
70 | 70 | | thousand dollars ($1,500,000) subject to inflation shall include an owner’s program manager and a 27 |
---|
71 | 71 | | commissioning agent. The cost of the program manager and commissioning agent shall be 28 |
---|
72 | 72 | | considered a project cost eligible for aid pursuant to §§ 16-7-41 and 16-105-5. 29 |
---|
73 | 73 | | (h) Temporary housing, or swing space, for students shall be a reimbursable expense so 30 |
---|
74 | 74 | | long as a district can demonstrate that no other viable option to temporarily house students exists 31 |
---|
75 | 75 | | and provided that use of the temporary space is time limited for a period not to exceed twenty-four 32 |
---|
76 | 76 | | (24) months and tied to a specific construction project. 33 |
---|
77 | 77 | | (i) Environmental site remediation, as defined by the school building authority, shall be a 34 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | LC001999 - Page 3 of 4 |
---|
81 | 81 | | reimbursable expense up to one million dollars ($1,000,000) per project. 1 |
---|
82 | 82 | | (j) If, within thirty (30) years of construction, a newly constructed school is sold to a private 2 |
---|
83 | 83 | | entity, the state shall receive a portion of the sale proceeds equal to that project’s housing aid 3 |
---|
84 | 84 | | reimbursement rate at the time of project completion. 4 |
---|
85 | 85 | | (k) All projects must comply with § 37-13-6, ensuring that prevailing wage laws are being 5 |
---|
86 | 86 | | followed, and § 37-14.1-6, ensuring that minority business enterprises reach a minimum of ten 6 |
---|
87 | 87 | | percent (10%) of the dollar value of the bid. The school housing aid ratio shall be increased by five 7 |
---|
88 | 88 | | percent (5%) for projects that ensure Rhode Island based minority business enterprises reach a 8 |
---|
89 | 89 | | minimum of twenty percent (20%) of the dollar value of the bid. 9 |
---|
90 | 90 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 10 |
---|
91 | 91 | | ======== |
---|
92 | 92 | | LC001999 |
---|
93 | 93 | | ======== |
---|
94 | 94 | | |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|
96 | 96 | | LC001999 - Page 4 of 4 |
---|
97 | 97 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
98 | 98 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
99 | 99 | | OF |
---|
100 | 100 | | A N A C T |
---|
101 | 101 | | RELATING TO EDUCATION -- FOUNDATION LEVEL SCH OOL SUPPORT |
---|
102 | 102 | | *** |
---|
103 | 103 | | This act would require that the school housing aid ratio shall be increased by five percent 1 |
---|
104 | 104 | | (5%) for projects that ensure Rhode Island based minority business enterprises reach a minimum 2 |
---|
105 | 105 | | of twenty percent (20%) of the dollar value of the bid. 3 |
---|
106 | 106 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 4 |
---|
107 | 107 | | ======== |
---|
108 | 108 | | LC001999 |
---|
109 | 109 | | ======== |
---|