1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 5800 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC001779 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO TAXATION -- STATEWIDE TANGIBLE PROPERTY TA X EXEMPTION |
---|
16 | 16 | | Introduced By: Representatives McEntee, Cortvriend, Phillips, Edwards, Caldwell, |
---|
17 | 17 | | Dawson, Finkelman, J. Lombardi, Vella-Wilkinson, and Batista |
---|
18 | 18 | | Date Introduced: February 22, 2023 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Referred To: House Finance |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 1. Title 44 of the General Laws entitled "TAXATION" is hereby amended by 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | adding thereto the following chapter: 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | CHAPTER 5.3 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | STATEWIDE TANGIBLE PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTION 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | 44-5.3-1. Statewide tangible property tax exemption. 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | (a) Notwithstanding the provisions of chapter 5 of this title or any other provisions to the 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | contrary, in an effort to provide relief for businesses, including small businesses, and to promote 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | economic development, all ratable, tangible personal property not otherwise exempt from taxation 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | shall be exempt from taxation up to and including the amount of assessed value set forth in 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | subsection (b) of this section. 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | (b) The exemption provided in subsection (a) of this section shall be up to and including 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | the following amounts: 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) Five thousand dollars ($5,000) for the tax year ending on December 31, 2023. 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) Twenty thousand dollars ($20,000) for the tax year ending on December 31, 2024. 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | (3) Fifty thousand dollars ($50,000) for the tax year ending on December 31, 2025. 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (4) One hundred thousand dollars ($100,000) for the tax year ending on December 31, 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | 2026. 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (5) Two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($250,000) for the tax year ending on December 18 |
---|
41 | 41 | | 31, 2027. 19 |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | LC001779 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
45 | 45 | | (c) Beginning in fiscal year 2024 and for each fiscal year through fiscal year 2028, cities, 1 |
---|
46 | 46 | | towns, and fire districts shall receive reimbursements, as set forth in this section, from state general 2 |
---|
47 | 47 | | revenues equal to the amount of lost tax revenues due to the reduction of the tangible property tax 3 |
---|
48 | 48 | | in the respective fiscal year as a result of the corresponding exemption set forth in subsections (a) 4 |
---|
49 | 49 | | and (b) of this section. For fiscal year 2029 and for each fiscal year thereafter, cities and towns, and 5 |
---|
50 | 50 | | fire districts shall receive reimbursements equal to the amounts of reimbursements received for 6 |
---|
51 | 51 | | fiscal year 2028. 7 |
---|
52 | 52 | | (d) Beginning in fiscal year 2024 and for each fiscal year through fiscal year 2028, each 8 |
---|
53 | 53 | | city, town, and fire district shall report to the department of revenue, as part of the submission of 9 |
---|
54 | 54 | | the certified tax levy pursuant to ยง 44-5-22, tangible property levy information sufficient to 10 |
---|
55 | 55 | | calculate reimbursements as set forth in subsection (c) of this section. 11 |
---|
56 | 56 | | (e) For purposes of this chapter, exemptions existing and uniformly applied to all tangible 12 |
---|
57 | 57 | | property taxpayers in any city, town, or fire district at the time of the effective date of this chapter 13 |
---|
58 | 58 | | shall be disregarded such that lost revenue to be reimbursed pursuant to this section for each 14 |
---|
59 | 59 | | respective city, town, or fire district shall include revenue loss resulting from such pre-existing 15 |
---|
60 | 60 | | exemptions. 16 |
---|
61 | 61 | | (f) Notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, the tax rate for the class of 17 |
---|
62 | 62 | | property that includes tangible personal property for any city, town, or fire district shall be capped 18 |
---|
63 | 63 | | and shall not exceed thereafter the tax rate in effect for the assessment date immediately preceding 19 |
---|
64 | 64 | | the property tax year for which the exemption set forth in subsections (a) and (b) of this section 20 |
---|
65 | 65 | | first applies. 21 |
---|
66 | 66 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 22 |
---|
67 | 67 | | ======== |
---|
68 | 68 | | LC001779 |
---|
69 | 69 | | ======== |
---|
70 | 70 | | |
---|
71 | 71 | | |
---|
72 | 72 | | LC001779 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
73 | 73 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
74 | 74 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
75 | 75 | | OF |
---|
76 | 76 | | A N A C T |
---|
77 | 77 | | RELATING TO TAXATION -- STATEWIDE TANGIBLE PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTIO N |
---|
78 | 78 | | *** |
---|
79 | 79 | | This act would exempt from taxation all ratable, tangible personal property of businesses, 1 |
---|
80 | 80 | | starting at five thousand dollars ($5,000) on December 31, 2023 and increasing every December 2 |
---|
81 | 81 | | 31 thereafter up to a maximum amount of two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($250,000) by 3 |
---|
82 | 82 | | December 31, 2027. This act would also provide for cities, towns, and fire districts to receive 4 |
---|
83 | 83 | | reimbursement from state general revenues equal to the amount of lost tax revenues due to the 5 |
---|
84 | 84 | | exemption. 6 |
---|
85 | 85 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 7 |
---|
86 | 86 | | ======== |
---|
87 | 87 | | LC001779 |
---|
88 | 88 | | ======== |
---|