Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5802 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- H 5802
66 ========
77 LC001587
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO TAXATION -- ESTATE AND TRANSFER TAXES -- LIABILITY AND
1616 COMPUTATION
1717 Introduced By: Representatives Costantino, Lima, Cardillo, Rea, Fellela, Baginski,
1818 Noret, and Casey
1919 Date Introduced: February 22, 2023
2020 Referred To: House Finance
2121
2222
2323 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2424 SECTION 1. Section 44-22-1.1 of the General Laws in Chapter 44-22 entitled "Estate and 1
2525 Transfer Taxes — Liability and Computation" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2626 44-22-1.1. Tax on net estate of decedent. 3
2727 (a)(1) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 1992, but prior to January 4
2828 1, 2002, a tax is imposed upon the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent 5
2929 as a tax upon the right to transfer. The tax is a sum equal to the maximum credit for state death 6
3030 taxes allowed by 26 U.S.C. § 2011. 7
3131 (2) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2002, but prior to January 1, 8
3232 2010, a tax is imposed upon the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent 9
3333 as a tax upon the right to transfer. The tax is a sum equal to the maximum credit for state death 10
3434 taxes allowed by 26 U.S.C. § 2011 as it was in effect as of January 1, 2001; provided, however, 11
3535 that the tax shall be imposed only if the net taxable estate shall exceed six hundred seventy-five 12
3636 thousand dollars ($675,000). Any scheduled increase in the unified credit provided in 26 U.S.C. § 13
3737 2010 in effect on January 1, 2001, or thereafter, shall not apply. 14
3838 (3) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2010, and prior to January 1, 15
3939 2015, a tax is imposed upon the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent 16
4040 as a tax upon the right to transfer. The tax is a sum equal to the maximum credit for state death 17
4141 taxes allowed by 26 U.S.C. § 2011 as it was in effect as of January 1, 2001; provided, however, 18
4242
4343
4444 LC001587 - Page 2 of 4
4545 that the tax shall be imposed only if the net taxable estate shall exceed eight hundred and fifty 1
4646 thousand dollars ($850,000); provided, further, beginning on January 1, 2011, and each January 1 2
4747 thereafter until January 1, 2015, said amount shall be adjusted by the percentage of increase in the 3
4848 Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-U) as published by the United States 4
4949 Department of Labor Statistics determined as of September 30 of the prior calendar year; said 5
5050 adjustment shall be compounded annually and shall be rounded up to the nearest five dollar ($5.00) 6
5151 increment. Any scheduled increase in the unified credit provided in 26 U.S.C. § 2010 in effect on 7
5252 January 1, 2003, or thereafter, shall not apply. 8
5353 (4) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2015, a tax is imposed upon 9
5454 the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent as a tax upon the right to 10
5555 transfer. The tax is a sum equal to the maximum credit for state death taxes allowed by 26 U.S.C. 11
5656 § 2011, as it was in effect as of January 1, 2001; provided, however, that a Rhode Island credit shall 12
5757 be allowed against any tax so determined in the amount of sixty-four thousand four hundred 13
5858 ($64,400). Any scheduled increase in the unified credit provided in 26 U.S.C. § 2010 in effect on 14
5959 January 1, 2003, or thereafter, shall not apply; provided, further, beginning on January 1, 2016, and 15
6060 each January 1 thereafter, said Rhode Island credit amount under this section shall be adjusted by 16
6161 the percentage of increase in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-U) as 17
6262 published by the United States Department of Labor Statistics determined as of September 30 of 18
6363 the prior calendar year; said adjustment shall be compounded annually and shall be rounded up to 19
6464 the nearest five dollar ($5.00) increment. 20
6565 (5) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2024, a tax is imposed upon 21
6666 the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent as a tax upon the right to 22
6767 transfer. The tax shall be imposed only if the net taxable estate shall exceed one million six hundred 23
6868 forty-eight thousand six hundred eleven dollars ($1,648,611); provided, further, beginning on 24
6969 January 1, 2025, and each January 1 thereafter, for a period of eight (8) years, said amount shall be 25
7070 increased by one-eighth (1/8) of the federal transfer tax exclusion amount then in effect, and 26
7171 continue thereafter, until the state transfer tax exclusion amount equals the federal transfer tax 27
7272 exclusion amount. 28
7373 (b) If the decedent’s estate contains property having a tax situs not within the state, then 29
7474 the tax determined by this section is reduced to an amount determined by multiplying the tax by a 30
7575 fraction whose numerator is the gross estate excluding all property having a tax situs not within the 31
7676 state at the decedent’s death and whose denominator is the gross estate. In determining the fraction, 32
7777 no deductions are considered and the gross estate is not reduced by a mortgage or other 33
7878 indebtedness for which the decedent’s estate is not liable. 34
7979
8080
8181 LC001587 - Page 3 of 4
8282 (c)(1) The terms “gross taxable estate,” “federal gross estate” or “net taxable estate” used 1
8383 in this chapter or chapter 23 of this title has the same meaning as when used in a comparable context 2
8484 in the laws of the United States, unless a different meaning is clearly required by the provisions of 3
8585 this chapter or chapter 23 of this title. Any reference in this chapter or chapter 23 of this title to the 4
8686 Internal Revenue Code or other laws of the United States means the Internal Revenue Code of 5
8787 1954, 26 U.S.C. § 1 et seq. 6
8888 (2) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2002, the terms “gross taxable 7
8989 estate” “federal gross estate” or “net taxable estate” used in this chapter or chapter 23 of this title 8
9090 has the same meaning as when used in a comparable context in the laws of the United States, unless 9
9191 a different meaning is clearly required by the provisions of this chapter or chapter 23 of this title. 10
9292 Any reference in this chapter or chapter 23 of this title to the Internal Revenue Code or other laws 11
9393 of the United States means the Internal Revenue Code of 1954, 26 U.S.C. § 1 et seq., as they were 12
9494 in effect as of January 1, 2001, unless otherwise provided. 13
9595 (d) All values are as finally determined for federal estate tax purposes. 14
9696 (e) Property has a tax situs within the state of Rhode Island: 15
9797 (1) If it is real estate or tangible personal property and has actual situs within the state of 16
9898 Rhode Island; or 17
9999 (2) If it is intangible personal property and the decedent was a resident. 18
100100 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 19
101101 ========
102102 LC001587
103103 ========
104104
105105
106106 LC001587 - Page 4 of 4
107107 EXPLANATION
108108 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
109109 OF
110110 A N A C T
111111 RELATING TO TAXATION -- ESTATE AND TRANSFER TAXES -- LIABILITY AND
112112 COMPUTATION
113113 ***
114114 This act would phase in an annual increase of the net taxable estate exemption over an eight 1
115115 (8) year period until the state exemption equals the federal exemption. 2
116116 This act would take effect upon passage. 3
117117 ========
118118 LC001587
119119 ========