House | 06/24/2023 | Vetoed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/18/2023) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |