Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Education | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2023) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/19/2023) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Education |