Senate | 06/14/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2023) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |